IL HB5072 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that public indecency also includes committing the proscribed acts while confined in a penal institution. Excludes from the definition of "penal institution" for this purpose a facility of the Department of Juvenile Justice or a juvenile detention facility. Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Includes in the definition of "sex offense", a second violation or attempted violation of public indecency while confined in a penal institution committed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act.
Title
PUBLIC INDECENCY IN PRISON
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 016-001-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5072&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5072.htm |