IL HB5061 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regional Water Commissions Division of the Illinois Municipal Code. Allows a regional water commission to provide for credits against amounts due to the commission from a municipality as a means to repay a municipality for specified costs incurred by the municipality relating to the regional water commission. Allows amendment or extension of specified contracts beyond 101 years by agreement of the parties. Provides that an owner of a bond issued under the Division, a trustee under a master trust indenture or supplemental trust indenture, or, in certain circumstances, both may enforce and compel performance relating to the bonds (now, only a holder of a bond issued under the Division has that right). Allows a commission to use alternate project delivery methods, establish goals or requirements for the procurement of goods and services and for construction contracts, accept assignment of municipal waterworks system contracts or other public improvement contracts, and take property by quick-take in specified circumstances. Makes other changes. Amends the Eminent Domain Act. Provides that a regional water commission may initiate quick-take proceedings for one period of 3 years after adoption of a schedule for acquisition of property or easements for the purposes of the regional water commission. Provides that the provisions do not authorize more than one 3-year quick-take period for any one regional water commission. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTIES CODE-DIVERSITY GOALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-01-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2023-01-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2023-01-05 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-01-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2023-01-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Mattson |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mattson |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Eric Mattson |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Eric Mattson |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Eric Mattson |
2023-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 5, 2023 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-10-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Counties & Townships Committee; 011-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |