IL HB5051 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Provides that rates and minimum mandated wage increases for homemaker services shall be, at minimum, a rate of $23.40 per hour beginning July 1, 2020 to sustain a minimum wage of $14 per hour, and a rate of $24.96 per hour beginning July 1, 2021 to sustain a minimum wage of $15 per hour. Provides that rates in State fiscal year 2023 and every State fiscal year thereafter shall be no lower than the rates in effect on July 1, 2021. Requires providers of in-home services to certify to the Department on Aging that they remain in compliance with the mandated wage increase for direct service workers. Provides that fringe benefits, including, but not limited to, paid time off and payment for training, health insurance, travel, or transportation shall not be reduced in relation to the rate increases described in the amendatory Act. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
AGING-HOMEMAKER SERVICES-RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5051&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5051.htm |