IL HB5047 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1059
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1059
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Presumptively Void Transfers Article of the Probate Act of 1975. Includes a civil union partner within the scope of the term "family member" and includes a transfer on death instrument within the scope of the term "transfer instrument". Makes changes regarding the rebuttable presumption that a transfer instrument is void if the transferee is a caregiver and the fair market value of the transferred property exceeds $20,000. Provides that if the property in question is an interest in real property, a bona fide purchaser or mortgagee for value shall take the subject property free and clear of the action challenging the transfer instrument if the transfer to the bona fide purchaser or mortgagee for value occurs prior to the recordation of a lis pendens for an action challenging the transfer. Sets forth conditions under which a financial institution or similar entity is not liable for distributing or releasing property when the transfer is challenged. Effective immediately.
Title
PROBATE ACT TRANSFER CAREGIVER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1059 |
2018-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | To Trusts & Estates Law Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 4a-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 5 | 4a-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |