IL HB5029 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0842
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0842
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that "agribusiness" means a business or businesses under the same name or ownership that are collectively associated with the production, processing, or distribution of agricultural products, or an organization that promotes the economic well-being and expansion of this State's agriculture industry. Effective immediately.
Title
AGRIBUSINESS SIGNS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0842 |
2018-08-14 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |