IL HB5000 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Chicago Local Government Vendor Diversity Act. Creates the Chicago Local Government Vendor Diversity Task Force to promote and encourage open access in the awarding of governmental contracts to businesses with diverse hiring practices. Sets forth the membership of the Task Force and the terms of office of its members. Provides that the Department of Central Management Services shall house, staff, and otherwise provide day-to-day support to the Task Force necessary to achieve the policy objectives and enforcement described in the Act. Requires vendors who enter into a contracts with a governmental participant on or after January 1, 2017 to file certain reports with the Department of Central Management Services. Provides that each vendor that fails to file a report is ineligible to do any business with or provide any services to any governmental participant. Effective immediately.
Title
CHICAGO-VENDOR DIVERSITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |