IL HB4958 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Healthcare and Family Services for the Medicaid Technical Assistance Center. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
$DHFS-MEDICAID TECH CENTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4958&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB4958.pdf |