IL HB4917 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
Pending: House Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that specified amounts shall be appropriated to specified units of local government for each of 28 specified Representative Districts for grants to community-based organizations based entirely within each of the specified Representative Districts that address violence prevention using a culturally competent approach and that are capable of decreasing violence in those Representative Districts. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$VIOLENCE PREVENTION GRANTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback