IL HB4908 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Early Intervention Services System Act. Provides that the Illinois Interagency Council on Early Intervention shall be composed of at least 20 but not more than 35 (rather than 30) members. Provides that the Council shall include: one member who is a representative of the Child Care Assistance Program; and one member who is a representative of the Education for Homeless Children and Youth Program authorized under the federal McKinney-Vento Homeless Assistance Act. In a provision permitting the Department of Human Services to enter into contracts for some or all of its responsibilities under the Act, removes language requiring such contracts to be subject to a request for proposals as described in the Illinois Procurement Code and to be posted on the early intervention website maintained by the Department during the entire bid period. Effective immediately.
Title
EARLY INTERVENTION SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 20 | 13.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4908&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4908.htm |