IL HB4871 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In provisions concerning the Community Care Program, provides that within 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, rates for adult days services shall be increased to $15.02 per hour and rates for each way transportation services for adult day services shall be increased to $10.30 per hour. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGING-ADULT DAY SERVICES RATES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201054.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback