IL HB4871 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In provisions concerning the Community Care Program, provides that within 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, rates for adult days services shall be increased to $15.02 per hour and rates for each way transportation services for adult day services shall be increased to $10.30 per hour. Effective immediately.
Title
AGING-ADULT DAY SERVICES RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 105 | 4.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4871&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4871.htm |