IL HB4868 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Requires facilities licensed under the Act to publish a record of all Type "AA", Type "A", and Type "B" violations of the facility received from the Department of Public Health for a period of no less than 5 years prior to the amendatory Act's effective date. Provides that the record must be published prominently on the facility's website. Provides disciplinary action for violation of the requirements.
Title
NURSING HOME CARE-RECORDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |