IL HB4860 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Unlawful Restrictions on the Use and Sale of Motor Vehicles Act. Provides that no State agency or unit of local government shall restrict the use or sale of a motor vehicle based on the energy source used to power the motor vehicle, including an energy source used for propulsion or used for powering other functions of the motor vehicle. Limits the concurrent exercise of home rule powers. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall not propose and the Illinois Pollution Control Board shall not adopt motor vehicle emissions standards that are established by California as a result of California having received a waiver pursuant to the federal Clean Air Act.
Title
VEHICLE SALE/USE & EMISSIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | To Environmental Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 13C-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4860&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4860.htm |