IL HB4810 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the Legislate Ethics Commission shall adopt no rule requiring the Legislative Inspector General to seek the Commission's advance approval before commencing any investigation or issuing a subpoena. Provides that any existing rule, as of the effective date of the amendatory Act, requiring the Legislative Inspectors General to seek the Commission's advance approval before commencing any investigation or issuing a subpoena is void. Removes language providing that the Legislative Inspector General needs the advance approval of the Commission to issue subpoenas. Provides that within 60 days after receipt of a summary report and response from the ultimate jurisdictional authority or agency head, the Executive and Legislative Ethics Commissions shall make available to the public the report and response or a redacted version of the report and response (currently, report required to be made public only if it resulted in a suspension of at least 3 days or termination of employment). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ETHICS COMM-INVESTIGATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-07-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-07-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2020-07-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2020-07-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-07-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-07-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2020-07-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2020-07-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2020-07-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 20-52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4810&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4810.htm |