IL HB4809 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
FINANCE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-03-28 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2012-03-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Watson |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Watson |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2012-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-03-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-02-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |