IL HB4783 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act. Provides that the mandatory competitive bid threshold for the District may not be less than $100,000 (rather than less than $10,000 or more than $40,000). Provides that the District's executive director shall authorize in writing specified officials or employees who may purchase in the open market without filing a requisition or estimate to purchase and without advertisement any supplies, materials, equipment or services for immediate delivery to meet bona fide operating emergencies where the amount is not in excess of $100,000 (rather than $50,000).
Title
MWRD-COMPETITIVE BIDDING LIMIT
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Yolanda Morris [D] |
Rep. Jawaharial Williams [D] | Sen. Mike Porfirio [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-010-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 027-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2605 | 11.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2605 | 11.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |