IL HB4765 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Landscape Architecture Registration Act. Provides that no person shall hold himself or herself out as a registered landscape architect without being registered by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Provides that the Department may issue certificates of registration to those who meet the requirements of the Act. Provides that the Department may authorize examinations to ascertain the fitness and qualifications of applicants for registration. Provides that the Department may conduct investigations and hearings to refuse to issue, renew, or restore registrations, revoke, suspend, place on probation, or reprimand persons registered under provisions of the Act. Provides that the Department may take disciplinary action with regard to any certificate of registration issued under the Act. Makes corresponding changes in the Park District Code, the Chicago Park District Act, the Professional Geologist Licensing Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to repeal the Landscape Architecture Registration Act on January 1, 2031.
Title
LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 745 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1205 | 8-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1505 | 26.10-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4765&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4765.htm |