IL HB4764 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that, for a period of one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act, no unit of local government, including a home rule unit, may enact or enforce an ordinance that restricts the operation of delivery trucks to certain times of the day. Provides that a unit of local government may regulate delivery trucks for traffic control purposes or in accordance with the Sections of the Code concerning mufflers, the prevention of noise, and engine braking. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-LOC GOV-DELIVERY TRUCKS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-02-17 | House | Racial Impact Note Requested by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-02-17 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-02-15 | House | Remains in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 004-007-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4764&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4764.htm |