IL HB4754 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Crime Reporting Act. Provides that a law enforcement agency shall publish monthly on its website, and submit to the Illinois State Police in a form, manner, and frequency as required by the Illinois State Police, the following information that occurred in the law enforcement agency's jurisdiction: (1) how many homicides occurred in a month based on the time of death of a victim; (2) how many of the homicides had an alleged perpetrator arrested and charged; and (3) how many homicides are considered cleared or closed for a reason other than the arrest and charging of an alleged perpetrator. Provides that information required to be published on a law enforcement agency's website must be published on the website by the end of the month following the reporting month. Effective January 1, 2025.
Title
UNIFORM CRIME REPORT-HOMICIDES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-005-000 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 709 | 5-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |