IL HB4746 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Restores the death penalty for the first degree murder of a peace officer killed while performing his or her official duties, to prevent the performance of his or her official duties, or in retaliation for performing his or her official duties, and the defendant knew or should have known that the murdered individual was a peace officer. Enacts the Capital Crimes Litigation Act of 2022. Provides specified funding and resources for cases in which a sentence of death is an authorized disposition. Creates the Capital Litigation Trust Fund. Provides that all unobligated and unexpended moneys in the Death Penalty Abolition Fund are transferred into the Capital Litigation Trust Fund. Amends the State Appellate Defender Act. Provides that in cases in which a sentence of death is an authorized disposition, the State Appellate Defender shall provide trial counsel with legal assistance and the assistance of expert witnesses, investigators, and mitigation specialists from funds appropriated to the State Appellate Defender specifically for that purpose by the General Assembly. Provides that the Office of State Appellate Defender shall not be appointed to serve as trial counsel in capital cases. Amends the Freedom of Information Act, the State Finance Act, and the Criminal Code of 2012 to make conforming changes.
Title
DEATH PENALTY-POLICE OFFICER
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Michael Marron [R] |
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] | Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.970 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 9-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 105 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 113-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 119-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4746&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4746.htm |