IL HB4745 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Department of Corrections and the Department of Juvenile Justice shall establish procedures to ensure that a committed person convicted of: (1) a sex offense, (2) first degree murder, or (3) second degree murder is discharged from custody within the municipality, or if the committed person was residing in an unincorporated area, the county where the committed person was residing immediately before his or her conviction for the sex offense or murder offense for which the committed person is serving a sentence in the Department of Corrections or the Department of Juvenile Justice. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-DISCHARGE-LOCATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | To Re-Entry Policy Subcommittee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-14-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4745&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4745.htm |