IL HB4641 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0833
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0833
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Adds requirements for approval of adoption-only homes by licensed child welfare agencies. Requires that, in approving an adoption-only home, if an adult resident has an arrest or conviction record, the licensed child welfare agency shall thoroughly investigate and evaluate the criminal history and the resident and shall not approve the home under specified circumstances. Amends the Adoption Act. Makes changes concerning the content of the Birth Parent Rights and Responsibilities-Private Form, including the right to provide medical, background, and family information to the child's prospective adoptive parents or their attorney through a voluntary Birth Parent Medical Information form. Provides that, prior to finalization of an adoption, any prospective adoptive parent in a private adoption who is not being provided with adoption services by a licensed child welfare agency, who is not adopting a related child, and who is not adopting a child who is a ward of the Department of Children and Family Services shall be provided an Adoptive Parent Rights and Responsibilities-Private Form. Adds additional requirements in cases of adoptions in which an Illinois licensed child welfare agency is not providing adoption services and the child who is the subject of the adoption is not a related child of the prospective adoptive parent and not under the custody or guardianship of the Department of Children and Family Services under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Makes other changes.
Title
CHILD CARE-ADOPTION-ONLY HOME
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0833 |
2016-08-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-12 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption Reform; 005-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Adoption Reform |
2016-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption Reform; 005-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2016-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Adoption Reform |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 10 | 2.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 2.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 2.23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 2.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 3.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 10 | 3.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 10 | 7.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 10 | 7.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 50 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 50 | 12.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
750 | 50 | 12.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |