IL HB4630 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-11 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that it shall not be unlawful for any person to drive or operate any non-highway vehicle upon any county roadway or township roadway for the purpose of conducting farming operations to and from the home, farm, farm buildings, and any adjacent or nearby farm land. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
VEH CD-NON-HWY VEH-FARMING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2009-10-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-05 | First Reading | |
2009-10-01 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Richard P. Myers |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4630&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4630.htm |