IL HB4614 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Financial Institutions Code. Creates a Supervisor of Consumer Credit and a Supervisor of Title Insurance. Removes the Supervisor of Consumer Finance Business and the Supervisor of Sales Finance Agencies. Amends the Currency Exchange Act. Removes language requiring a licensee to file an annual report, annual bonds, and insurance policies at the same time the licensee pays his or her annual license fees. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCIAL INST CURRENCY EXCH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0549 |
2016-07-15 | House | Effective Date July 15, 2016 |
2016-07-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 006-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2016-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 019-000-000 |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Brown |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1205 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 405 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |