IL HB4604 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0866
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0866
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Changes the name of the fee from "Public Hunting Grounds for Pheasants" to "Public Hunting Grounds for Game Birds". Provides that the Department of Natural Resources may permit hunters to take bobwhite quail, chukar partridge, and gray partridge on public hunting grounds. Authorizes the Department to set the hunting season for game birds by administrative rule between the dates of September 1st and March 31st, both inclusive.
Title
WILDLIFE CD-HUNTING-GAME BIRDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0866 |
2016-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-003-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-001-000 |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 1.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |