IL HB4588 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of violation of a parole host agreement. Provides that a person commits the offense when he or she hosts a releasee and he or she knowingly violates a term of the parole host agreement. Provides that a person also commits violation of a parole host agreement when he or she hosts a releasee and he or she knowingly stores or leaves, within premises under his or her control, a firearm if the person knows or has reason to believe that the releasee is likely to gain access to the firearm and the releasee gains access to the firearm. Provides exceptions. Provides that violation of a parole host agreement is a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that if the releasee gains access to the host's firearm, the violation is a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that if the releasee uses the firearm in the commission of an offense that does not result in death or great bodily harm to another person, the host is guilty of a Class 4 felony and a Class 3 felony if the releasee's use of the firearm proximately causes death or great bodily harm to another person.
Title
CRIM CD-PAROLE HOST VIOLATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-04-12 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 002-003-000; -FAILED |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-04-09 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 31A-0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 31A-1.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |