IL HB4572 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that "employer" includes any person employing one (instead of 15) or more employees within Illinois during 20 or more calendar weeks within the calendar year of or preceding the alleged violation.
Title
HUM RIGHTS-EMPLOYER-DEFINITION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-08-13 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-013-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 010-003-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 064-037-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-006-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-19 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2018-04-17 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2018-04-12 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2018-04-12 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2018-04-12 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2018-04-11 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2018-04-11 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-11 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-11 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-11 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-11 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-11 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-11 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-11 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-11 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-11 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-010-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |