IL HB4563 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-16 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee; (Motion to Discharge Committee)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-16 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee; (Motion to Discharge Committee)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Allows a school district, by resolution of its board, to operate on a 4-day school week plan approved by the State Board of Education. Provides that a school district that operates on a 4-day school week plan must ensure a minimum of 880 hours of student contact in addition to required institute days (instead of requiring a minimum term of 185 days). Makes related changes. Removes a provision referring to the closing of schools on January 29, 1981. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-4 DAY SCH WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-16 | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee; (Motion to Discharge Committee) | |
2009-05-28 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-18 | First Reading | |
2009-05-18 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4563&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4563.htm |