IL HB4552 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0547
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Adult Protective Services Act. Adds State's Attorney's offices to the list of persons and agencies granted access, upon request, to records concerning reports of abuse, neglect, financial exploitation, or self-neglect. Removes a provision making such records subject to disclosure as authorized by other applicable law. Effective immediately.
Title
AGING-ABUSE RECORDS-DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0547 |
2016-07-15 | House | Effective Date July 15, 2016 |
2016-07-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2016-04-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 20 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |