IL HB4533 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act and the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that an elected or appointed member of a public body of a municipality may satisfy the training requirements under the Open Meetings Act and a Freedom of Information Officer may satisfy the training requirements under the Freedom of Information Act by participating in a course of training sponsored or conducted by the Illinois Municipal League. Provides content requirements for the training. Provides that if an organization representing municipalities provides training, it must provide a certificate of course completion to each elected or appointed member of a public body who successfully completes that course of training.
Title
OPEN MEETINGS/FOIA-TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 1.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |