IL HB4526 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-20 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-20 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to adopt rules, no later than 90 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, for the legally recognized services of persons licensed under other laws of this State as a clinical social worker.
Title
DHFS-MEDICAID-SOCIAL WORKER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-02-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4526&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4526.htm |