IL HB4519 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Library District Act. Provides that territory annexed by a public library district included within a municipality or school district shall be approved by ordinance of the board, publication or posting, and voter referendum (rather than only by ordinance of the board with the option for a back-door referendum to prevent the annexation). Repeals provisions allowing a referendum to disconnect annexed territory from a library district. Effective immediately.
Title
LIBRARIES-TERRITORY ANNEXATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 16 | 15-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
75 | 16 | 15-20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4519&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4519.htm |