IL HB4510 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to teacher evaluations, provides that no later than September 1, 2021, each school district must establish a teacher evaluation plan that ensures that each teacher in contractual continued service whose performance is rated as either "excellent" or "proficient" is evaluated at least once in the course of the 3 school years after receipt of the rating (rather than at least once in the course of every 2 school years) and establish an informal teacher evaluation plan that ensures that each teacher in contractual continued service whose performance is rated as either "excellent" or "proficient" is informally evaluated at least once in the course of the 2 school years after receipt of the rating.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHER EVALUATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-000-000 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |