IL HB4502 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Modifies the definition of "supervisor" under the Act. Provides that in fire fighter units (rather than new fire fighter units), employees shall consist of fire fighters of the highest rank of company officer and below (currently, highest rank not specified). Provides that a company officer may be responsible for multiple companies or apparatus on a shift, multiple stations, or an entire shift. Provides that there may be more than one company officer per shift. Provides that all other ranks above that of the highest company officer shall be supervisors (currently, highest rank not specified).
Title
LABOR-FIRE FIGHTER SUPERVISOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |