IL HB4469 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that each election authority shall collaborate with the county jail within the jurisdiction of the election authority to facilitate voting by mail for voters eligible to vote in the county who are confined or detained in the county jail. Provides that in a county with a population of 3,000,000 or more, the election authority in the county shall establish a temporary branch polling place in the county jail. Contains additional provisions concerning the temporary branch polling place in the county jail. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that each election authority shall collaborate with the county jail within the jurisdiction of the election authority to facilitate voter registration for voters eligible to vote in that county who are confined or detained in the county jail. Provides that a county jail shall provide a voter registration application to any person in custody at the jail who requests an application and is eligible to vote. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that upon release of a person who is eligible to vote, the Department of Corrections shall provide the person with a specified form that informs him or her that his or her voting rights have been restored. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections and Counties Code. Provides that upon discharge from a county jail or release from the Department of Corrections, a person shall be provided with a voter registration form. Provides that the Department, each county jail, and each county probation office shall provide an individual in its custody with specified information on voting rights. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
JAILS-PRISONS-VOTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 37 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 37 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-017-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-004-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-037-001 |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-11 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 19-2.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 19A-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-15003.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 3-15003.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-14-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-2.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |