IL HB4441 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Establishes the fiscal year 2017 mileage reimbursement rate and allowance for lodging and meals. Amends the Compensation Review Act. Prohibits cost-of-living adjustments for or during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2016 for State government legislative and executive elected officers and appointees in positions for which the Compensation Review Board previously recommended or determined compensation. Effective immediately.
Title
GENERAL ASSEMBLY COMPENSATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2016-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-01-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-15 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 120 | 6.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4441&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4441.htm |