IL HB4423 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-04 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-04 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families program, provides that the child support collected on behalf of a family shall be passed through to the family and disregarded in determining the amount of the assistance grant provided to the family under the program (rather than the first $100 of child support collected on behalf of a family in a month for one child and the first $200 of child support collected on behalf of a family in a month for 2 or more children shall be passed through to the family and disregarded in determining the amount of the assistance grant provided to the family under the program). Provides that beginning October 1, 2022 (rather than October 1, 2018) the Department of Human Services shall increase TANF grant amounts in effect on September 30, 2022 (rather than September 30, 2018) to at least 50% (rather than 30%) of the most recent United States Department of Health and Human Services Federal Poverty Guidelines for each family size. Provides that beginning October 1, 2023 (rather than October 1, 2019), and each October 1 thereafter, the maximum benefit levels shall be annually adjusted to remain equal to at least 50% (rather than 30%) of the most recent poverty guidelines updated periodically in the Federal Register by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services for each family size. Effective October 1, 2022.
Title
TANF-GRANT INCREASES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Eric Mattson |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L Cervantes |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-21 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 023-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-02-03 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 12-4.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 4-1.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |