IL HB4395 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1041
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1041
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Removes the prohibition on a candidate for elective office who is required to file a statement of economic interests in relation to his or her candidacy from using the Internet to file his or her statement of economic interests.
Title
ETHICS-INTERNET BASED FILING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1041 |
2018-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-02-14 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 4A-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |