IL HB4389 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0803
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0803
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that the Governor shall annually designate by official proclamation the day after Gold Star Mothers' Day as Gold Star Family Day to be observed throughout the State as a day to honor and commemorate the families of men and women who gave their lives while serving with the armed forces of the United States in time of war or during periods of hostilities. Effective immediately.
Title
DATES-GOLD STAR FAMILY DAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0803 |
2016-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 15, 2016 |
2016-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 019-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2016-02-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 490 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |