IL HB4379 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Government Travel Expense Control Act. Provides that school districts and non-home rule units of local government shall, by resolution or ordinance, regulate travel, meal, and lodging expenses of officers and employees including: (1) the types of official business for which travel, meal, and lodging expenses are allowable; (2) maximum allowable reimbursement for travel, meal, and lodging expenses; and (3) a standardized form for submission of travel, meal, and lodging expenses. Provides that all travel, meal, and lodging expenses may only be approved after specified documentation has been submitted and the expenses are approved by a roll call vote. Prohibits reimbursing entertainment expenses.
Title
LOCAL GOV-TRAVEL EXPENSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0604 |
2016-07-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 006-000-002 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
2016-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-01-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-01-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-01-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-01-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-01-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2016-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2016-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2016-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-01-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |