IL HB4365 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Allows a student's (instead of child's) individualized education program (IEP) team to determine whether the special education program of a school district is unable to meet the needs of a child with a disability. Provides that the financial responsibility and reimbursement of the resident district of a child with a disability applies to emergency placements in nonpublic special education facilities that are not approved by the State Board of Education. Provides that a school district may place a student in a nonpublic special education facility providing educational services within the facility, but not approved by the State Board of Education, under specified circumstances. Removes provisions that provide that a school district has no obligation to pay a residential facility unless and until specified proof is provided to the satisfaction of the State Board of Education. Removes provisions that provide that if the State Board of Education denies approval in writing or does not respond to a facility's or resident district's request for approval within 10 days after the request is submitted to the State Board of Education, the matter shall be referred to the Community and Residential Services Authority, which shall make the determination and notify the facility or resident district and the State Board of Education within 10 days after the Authority receives the referral. Provides that emergency placement in an approved facility may continue so long as (i) the student's IEP team determines annually that such placement continues to be appropriate to meet the student's needs and (ii) at least every 3 years following the student's placement, the IEP team reviews appropriate placements approved by the State Board of Education. Removes changes to provisions concerning placement in a residential facility and payment of educational costs and provisions concerning the Community and Residential Services Authority. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHCD-SPEC ED/PRIVATE FACILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0703 |
2022-04-22 | House | Effective Date April 22, 2022 |
2022-04-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-03-01 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-03-01 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-15.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 14-7.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 14-7.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |