IL HB4344 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0802
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0802
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Heroes Way Designation Program Act. Allows a person who is related to a member of the United States Armed Forces who was killed in action while performing active military duty to apply for a designation allowing the placement of an honorary sign along designated Illinois roads. Provides that honorary signs may be placed upon interstate or state-numbered highway interchanges or upon bridges or segments of highway on the State highway system. Provides requirements for petition and approval of applications by the General Assembly to designate a specified road. Provides that no interchange, bridge, or highway may be named or designated after more than one member of the United States Armed Forces killed in action, nor may a designated member of the United States Armed Forces be eligible for more than one interchange, bridge, or highway designation. Provides that any highway signs erected for any designation shall be erected and maintained for a 20-year period, after which the signs shall be subject to removal, and the interchange, bridge, or highway may be subject to a new designation, absent an application to retain designation. Defines "Department", "Secretary", and "United States Armed Forces".
Title
HEROES WAY ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0802 |
2016-08-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2016 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2016-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 020-000-000 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | First Reading |
2015-11-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |