IL HB4336 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the standard registration fee for passenger motor vehicles of the first division and motor vehicles of the second division weighing not more than 8,000 pounds shall be reduced by 50% for any vehicle owner who is a veteran of the United States Armed Forces. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
VETERAN REGISTRATION FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-806.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4336&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4336.htm |