IL HB4334 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that an applicant for a school bus driver permit who is unable to submit fingerprints due to a condition that has removed his or her fingerprints shall submit to a non-fingerprint based criminal background check. Provides that non-fingerprint based criminal background checks shall be conducted through a search of the Illinois State Police's computerized criminal history record files using identifiers such as the name, sex, race, and date of birth of the applicant. Makes conforming changes.
Title
VEH CD-SCH BUS DRIVER PERMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-106.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |