IL HB4325 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that the definition of "licensed establishment" includes any distillery where alcoholic liquor is drawn, poured, mixed, or otherwise served for consumption on the premises. Effective immediately.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-DISTILLERIES
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-033-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2015-11-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |