IL HB4318 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-11)
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0823
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-11)
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0823
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Agriculture may sell at cost, to qualified applicants, signs designating an agribusiness that has been operated for 100 years or more or more than 150 years or more as the same agribusiness. Defines "agribusiness".
Title
SIGNS DESIGNATING AGRIBUSINESS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0823 |
2016-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2016-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture; sg |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2016-04-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2016-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-01-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2015-11-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2015-10-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-10-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2015-10-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-10-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-10-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |