IL HB4315 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0865
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0865
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that Illinois Route 66 license plates can be affixed to motorcycles having an engine over 150cc. Requires the Secretary of State to issue a version of the Route 66 license plates in a form appropriate for motorcycles.
Title
VEH CD-RTE 66 MOTORCYCLE PLATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0865 |
2016-08-22 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-02 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-01-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2015-10-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-10-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-661 | Amended Code | Citation Text |