IL HB4309 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides that the Toll Highway Authority may not enter into any contract relating to the ownership or use of real property unless the identity of every owner and beneficiary having any interest in the property and every member, shareholder, limited partner, or general partner entitled to receive more than 7.5% of the total distributable income of any limited liability company, corporation, or limited partnership having any interest in the property is disclosed. Deletes provisions related to: condemnation proceedings; beneficial interests; and written statements. Provides that the Authority must file the statement of record with the record of each county in which any part of the land is located within 7 (rather than 3) business days after the statement is filed with the Authority.
Title
TOLL HIGHWAY-LAND DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 10 | 9.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |