IL HB4306 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-01 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-01 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Charter Schools Law of the School Code. With respect to a charter school's retention of an outside, independent contractor to audit the charter school's finances, provides that the contractor shall not be an employee of the charter school or affiliated with the charter school or its authorizer in any way, other than to audit the charter school's finances. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
SCH CD-CHARTER SCH AUDITOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |