IL HB4289 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a credit for wages paid pursuant to a qualified apprenticeship program. Provides that a "qualified apprenticeship program" means an apprenticeship program in manufacturing, plastics, or construction trades that is certified by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity and at least 4 years in duration. Provides that the credit may not exceed the lesser of (i) 50% of the wages paid by the taxpayer to each apprentice during the taxable year or (ii) $4,800 per apprentice. Provides that the credit may be carried forward for 5 taxable years. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-APPRENTICE CREDIT
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4289&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4289.htm |